There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to exempt certain full-time health-care professionals of the Department of Veterans Affairs from restrictions on remunerated outside professional activities.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/10/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/02/1995Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-226.
04/04/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/28/1996HouseFor Further Action See H.R.3118.
10/11/1995SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
10/10/1995-3:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/1995-3:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/10/1995-3:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with up to forty minutes of debate.
10/10/1995-3:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9759-9761)
10/10/1995-3:02pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/02/1995HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 118.
08/02/1995HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-226.
06/15/1995HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/15/1995HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/11/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
05/11/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
04/05/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/04/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/04/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/04/1995 Referred to
06/15/1995 Markup by
08/02/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-226
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care04/05/1995 Referred to
05/11/1995 Markup by
05/11/1995 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs10/11/1995 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1384. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/10/1995)

Exempts under certain circumstances registered nurses, physician's assistants, and expanded-duty dental auxiliaries of the Veterans Health Administration (VHA) of the Department of Veterans Affairs from Federal provisions prohibiting VHA employees from assuming responsibility for the medical care of any patient other than a patient admitted for treatment at a Department facility.