Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/11/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/11/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/07/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/20/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/20/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/20/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/20/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/20/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/27/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/27/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/27/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/27/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/01/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/04/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 08/04/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/04/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 08/04/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/07/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/07/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/07/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/07/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/07/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/29/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 11/01/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 11/01/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/10/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/10/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/14/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/17/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/17/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 11/17/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/20/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 12/06/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 12/18/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/25/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/25/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/28/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/28/1996
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/29/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/29/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/29/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/29/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/07/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/07/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/07/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/14/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/14/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/14/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/14/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/14/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/20/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/20/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 03/20/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/21/1996
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 03/21/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/21/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/21/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/21/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/21/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/21/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/21/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/22/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/22/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/22/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/22/1996
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/22/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/22/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/22/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/22/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/22/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/22/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/27/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 03/27/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/27/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/29/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/25/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/07/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/07/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/30/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/30/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 07/30/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/30/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/30/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/30/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/31/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/31/1996
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 07/31/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/01/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 08/01/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/02/1996
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/04/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/04/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/04/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/26/1996