There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to allow revision of veterans benefits decisions based on clear and unmistakable error.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/10/1996Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-571.
04/07/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
05/22/1996SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
05/21/1996-2:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/1996-2:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/21/1996-2:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
05/21/1996-2:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5311-5313)
05/21/1996-2:26pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/10/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 280.
05/10/1996HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-571.
05/08/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/08/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/17/1996HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance, and Memorial Affairs
04/17/1996HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance, and Memorial Affairs
10/12/1995HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance, and Memorial Affairs
09/28/1995HouseExecutive Comment Received from Veterans' Affairs.
07/25/1995HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Veterans' Affairs.
05/09/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/07/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/07/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/07/1995 Referred to
05/08/1996 Markup by
05/10/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-571
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance, and Memorial Affairs05/09/1995 Referred to
10/12/1995 Hearings by
04/17/1996 Markup by
04/17/1996 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/1996 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1483.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1483. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/07/1995)

Subjects veterans' benefits claim decisions made by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs or the Board of Veterans' Appeals to revision on the grounds of clear and unmistakable error. Requires reversal or revision of such decision, by the same party making the original decision, if evidence establishes such error. Allows review requests for determining the existence of such error to be instituted by the Secretary, the Board, or the claimant.