Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/28/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/28/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/28/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/28/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/28/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/28/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/28/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/28/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/28/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/28/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/28/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/28/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/28/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/28/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/28/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/28/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/28/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/28/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/28/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/28/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/28/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/28/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/28/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/04/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/08/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/08/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/08/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/13/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/13/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/13/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/13/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/13/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 09/13/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/13/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/13/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/20/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/20/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 09/20/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/20/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 09/27/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 09/27/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/12/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/12/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/12/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/12/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/18/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 10/18/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/18/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/18/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/26/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/26/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/26/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/26/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/26/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 10/26/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 11/01/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 11/01/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/09/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/09/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/09/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/09/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/09/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/17/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/17/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/17/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/17/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/13/1996