Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/07/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 04/07/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/01/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/01/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/01/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/18/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/22/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/06/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/09/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/09/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/09/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/09/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/09/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/13/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/20/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/20/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/20/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/22/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/22/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/13/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/26/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/07/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/25/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/08/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/20/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/29/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/29/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/30/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/24/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/28/1996
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/04/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/04/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/06/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/21/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 03/22/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/27/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/28/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/17/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/29/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/27/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/02/1996