Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/07/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/07/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/07/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/09/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/09/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/09/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/18/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/18/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/18/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/22/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/13/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/13/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/24/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/24/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 08/04/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/28/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/11/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/12/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/12/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/12/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/12/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/12/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/17/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/17/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/19/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/19/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/07/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/14/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/12/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/19/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 05/29/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/25/1996