Committees: H.R.1514 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce04/07/1995 Referred to
04/16/1996 Markup by
06/27/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-655
House Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power04/24/1995 Referred to
10/26/1995 Hearings by
03/05/1996 Markup by
03/05/1996 Reported by
House Science04/07/1995 Referred to
07/10/1996 Discharged from
House Science Subcommittee on Energy and Environment04/13/1995 Referred to