Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/15/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/15/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/15/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/18/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/22/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/22/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/24/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/24/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/06/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/19/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/19/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/30/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/30/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/30/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/30/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/10/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/10/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/19/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/27/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/07/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/28/1995