Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/17/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/17/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/17/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/17/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/17/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/17/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/17/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/25/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/25/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/25/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/25/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/25/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/25/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/25/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/25/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/25/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/25/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/08/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/08/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/08/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/08/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/08/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/08/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/08/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/08/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/08/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/21/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/21/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/21/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/21/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/21/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/12/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/12/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/12/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/12/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/25/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/25/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/25/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/25/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/25/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/25/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/25/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/01/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/01/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/01/1996