Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/02/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/12/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/08/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/15/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/15/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/11/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 12/04/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 12/04/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 12/13/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/22/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/06/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/07/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/15/1996