Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/12/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/12/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/12/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/12/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/12/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/12/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/12/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/12/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/12/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/12/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/12/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/12/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/12/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/12/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/12/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/24/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/24/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/24/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/24/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/24/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/24/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/24/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/24/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/24/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/24/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/24/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/24/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/24/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/24/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/08/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/08/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/08/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/08/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/08/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/08/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/08/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/08/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/08/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/08/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/16/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/16/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/16/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/16/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 06/16/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/16/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/16/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/16/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/16/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/30/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/30/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/30/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/30/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/13/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/13/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/13/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 08/04/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/04/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/04/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/08/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/08/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/08/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/08/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/08/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/27/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/24/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/05/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/05/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/05/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/29/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/29/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/29/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/29/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/29/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/08/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/08/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/08/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/08/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/08/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/08/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/08/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/06/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/06/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 06/06/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/06/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/06/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/06/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/06/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/06/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/27/1996