Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/03/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 05/03/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/03/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/09/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/10/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/10/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/15/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/15/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/15/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/15/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/15/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/15/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/17/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/17/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/21/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/24/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/12/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/12/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 12/22/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/22/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 01/04/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/04/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/23/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/23/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/27/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/28/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/28/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/30/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/28/1996