There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend through December 31, 1997, the period during which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs is authorized to provide priority health care to certain veterans exposed to Agent Orange, ionizing radiation, or environmental hazards.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/26/1995Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-158.
05/03/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/13/1996HouseSee H.R.3643.
02/13/1996HouseSee H.R.2353.
06/28/1995SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
06/27/1995-12:57pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/27/1995-12:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/1995-12:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/27/1995-12:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
06/27/1995-12:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6319-6323)
06/27/1995-12:32pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/26/1995HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 75.
06/26/1995HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-158.
06/15/1995HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/15/1995HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/15/1995HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Veterans' Affairs.
05/11/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
05/11/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
05/09/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/03/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/03/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs05/03/1995 Referred to
06/15/1995 Markup by
06/26/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-158
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care05/09/1995 Referred to
05/11/1995 Markup by
05/11/1995 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/28/1995 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1565. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/27/1995)

Makes a veteran exposed to herbicides in Vietnam during the Vietnam era eligible for hospital and nursing home care for any disease for which the National Academy of Sciences (NAS), in a report issued under the Agent Orange Act of 1991, has determined that: (1) there is sufficient evidence to conclude a positive association between the occurrence of the disease and exposure to a herbicide; (2) there is evidence suggestive of such an association, though the evidence is limited; or (3) available studies are insufficient to permit such a conclusion. Makes such veterans eligible for such care also for a disease for which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, pursuant to a recommendation of the Under Secretary for Health based on peer-reviewed research studies published after the most recent NAS report, determines that there is credible evidence suggestive of an association between disease occurrence and herbicide exposure.

Makes a veteran exposed to radiation during a period of active duty for training or inactive duty training eligible for hospital and nursing home care for: (1) any diseases currently listed in Federal provisions which presume a relation between such disease and a veteran's disability; or (2) any disease for which the Secretary determines there is credible evidence of a positive association between the occurrence of such disease and exposure to ionizing radiation.

Extends through December 31, 1997, the authorized period for the provision of hospital, nursing home, and outpatient care for certain veterans, including those herbicide- or radiation-exposed veterans described in this Act.