Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/09/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/09/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/10/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/10/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/10/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/11/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/11/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/15/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/15/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/15/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/15/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/17/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/17/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/17/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/17/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/17/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/17/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/17/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/18/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/24/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/06/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/06/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/06/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/06/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/08/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/08/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/08/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/09/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/09/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/13/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/13/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/13/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/13/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/13/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/13/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/14/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/14/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/16/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/16/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 06/16/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/20/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/20/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/20/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/20/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/10/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/10/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/12/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/17/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/17/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/19/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/19/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/20/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/31/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/03/1995