Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 05/09/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/09/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 05/09/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/24/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/24/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/24/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/24/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/24/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/24/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/24/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/24/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/22/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/22/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/22/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/22/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/22/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/22/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/22/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/22/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/22/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/22/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/22/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/06/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/06/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/06/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/06/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/06/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 09/06/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/06/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 09/06/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/06/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/06/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/06/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/06/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/21/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 09/21/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/21/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/21/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/24/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/24/1995