There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Social Security Act and title 38, United States Code, to provide for sharing of medical information relating to determination of disability between the Social Security Administration and Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
10/12/1995Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance, and Memorial Affairs
06/08/1995Executive Comment Requested from Veterans' Affairs.
05/25/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/15/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/10/1995Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/1995Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/1995Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/10/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/10/1995 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension, Insurance, and Memorial Affairs05/25/1995 Referred to
10/12/1995 Hearings by
House Ways and Means05/10/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources05/15/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1609.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1609. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/10/1995)

Amends titles II ( Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) and XVI (Supplemental Security Income Program for the Aged, Blind, and Disabled) of the Social Security Act to require the Commissioner of Social Security , with the approval of the veteran involved, to provide the Secretary of Veterans Affairs with medical information regarding eligibility determinations for disability benefits under such titles.

Amends provisions of Federal law relating to veterans to direct the Secretary, when there is an issue of the nature or degree of a disease or disability, to request the Commissioner to provide to the Secretary such medical information obtained when determining the veteran's eligibility under titles II or XVI of the Social Security Act. Requires the Secretary, in those cases where a determination has not been made by the Secretary, to accept the Commissioner's determination regarding the existence of a disability or the nature or degree of such disability for purposes of laws administered by the Secretary.