Committees: H.R.1617 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Economic and Educational05/11/1995 Referred to
05/24/1995 Markup by
06/22/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-152
House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families05/12/1995 Referred to
05/16/1995 Markup by
05/16/1995 Reported by
House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education, Training and Life-Long Learning05/12/1995 Referred to
05/17/1995 Markup by
05/17/1995 Reported by
Senate Labor and Human Resources09/21/1995 Referred to
10/11/1995 Discharged from