Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 05/11/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/11/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/07/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/07/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/07/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/13/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/13/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/13/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/12/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/20/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/25/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/25/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/25/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 04/25/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 04/25/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/25/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/25/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/07/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 05/14/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/14/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/16/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/22/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/09/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/09/1996