Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/15/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/07/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/08/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/08/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/08/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/08/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/08/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 06/27/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/27/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/30/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/30/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/30/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/30/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/30/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 11/02/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/02/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/09/1995