Committees: H.R.1655 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)05/17/1995 Referred to
05/18/1995 Markup by
06/14/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-138,Part 1
House National Security06/14/1995 Referred to
07/19/1995 Discharged from
House Government Reform and Oversight06/23/1995 Referred to
07/18/1995 Markup by
07/19/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-138,Part 2
House Government Reform and Oversight Subcommittee on Civil Service07/07/1995 Referred to
07/12/1995 Markup by
07/12/1995 Reported by
Senate Intelligence (Select)09/14/1995 Referred to
09/29/1995 Discharged from