Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/17/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/17/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/24/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/24/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/24/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/24/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/16/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 06/16/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 06/16/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/16/1995
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/16/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/16/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/28/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/28/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/28/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/28/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/28/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/28/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/11/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/11/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/27/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/27/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/27/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/27/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/27/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/20/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/20/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/20/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/30/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/30/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/30/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/13/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 12/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/07/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/29/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/29/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/08/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/08/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/08/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/08/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/08/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/08/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/08/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/08/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/08/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/13/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/17/1996