Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/23/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/23/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 05/23/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/23/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/11/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/11/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 07/11/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/11/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/31/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/31/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/31/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/31/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 09/13/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/13/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/13/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/28/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/28/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/28/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/01/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/01/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 11/01/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 11/01/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/01/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/18/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 12/18/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 12/18/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/07/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/07/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/07/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/07/1996