There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Homesteading and Neighborhood Restoration Act of 1995

Short Titles as Introduced

Homesteading and Neighborhood Restoration Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for innovative approaches for homeownership opportunity and provide for the temporary extension of the rural rental housing program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
10/30/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
05/24/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/31/1995SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
10/30/1995-4:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/30/1995-4:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/30/1995-4:41pmHouseMr. Lazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/30/1995-4:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/30/1995-4:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11392-11398)
05/25/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 4.
Action By: House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity
05/25/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity
05/25/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
05/24/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services. a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/24/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/26/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/26/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/26/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/26/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/26/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/26/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/26/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/26/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/26/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/26/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 07/26/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/26/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 07/26/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/26/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/26/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/26/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/26/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/26/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/26/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/26/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/26/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/26/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/26/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/26/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/26/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/26/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/26/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/26/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/26/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/26/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/26/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/26/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/26/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/26/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/26/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/26/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/26/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/26/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/1995
Rep. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR-1] 10/24/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/24/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/24/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/24/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/24/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/24/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/24/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/24/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/24/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/24/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/24/1995

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services05/24/1995 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity05/25/1995 Referred to
05/25/1995 Markup by
05/25/1995 Reported by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs10/31/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1691.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1691. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/30/1995)

Homesteading and Neighborhood Restoration Act of 1995 - Directs the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to make equal grants to Habitat for Humanity International and other national or regional organizations or consortia for the construction of new, safe, and sanitary dwellings in the United States, including land acquisitions and infrastructure improvement. Funds such program through existing unused assisted housing funds.

(Sec. 3) Amends the Housing Act of 1949 to extend through FY 1996: (1) the multifamily rural housing loan program; and (2) the nonprofit entity set-aside.

(Sec. 4) Revises such program to: (1) limit project ownership transfers to situations where the Secretary determines such transfer to be in the best interests of the tenants and the Federal Government; (2) repeal equity loan reserve account payment provisions; (3) repeal prohibitions related to remote rural areas, areas without essential services, and certain geographic areas; (4) direct the Secretary to establish an objective procedure to allocate projects in areas of greatest need; and (5) deny equity loans to extend low-income use unless the Secretary determines that other incentives will not provide a fair return of investment, prevent loan prepayment, or prevent tenant displacement.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes loan guarantees for low- and moderate-income rural multifamily rental housing through FY 1996. Limits guarantees to the unpaid principal and interest. Sets forth borrower, housing, and lender eligibility provisions. Limits loan terms to not more than 40 years. Authorizes a one percent guarantee fee. Permits loan refinancing. Sets forth foreclosure provisions. Provides for tenant protections. Requires a program report.

Requires a geographical targeting study for such program.

Establishes a $1 million annual loan guarantee ceiling.

Authorizes FY 1996 appropriations. Terminates such program after September 30, 1996.