There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Debt Collection Practices Amendments of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve the administration of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/02/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
05/25/1995Referred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/30/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/21/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/17/1995
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/17/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/19/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/17/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 12/21/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/24/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/24/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 01/24/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/29/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/07/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/07/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/07/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/21/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/29/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/25/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/07/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/23/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/23/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/06/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/09/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/31/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/12/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/26/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services05/25/1995 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit06/02/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1711.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1711. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/1995)

Amends the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act to make it a violation of such Act for the debt collector to fail to disclose the attempt to collect a debt in the first written communication with a consumer (currently, in all communications made to collect a debt).

Requires that the consumer notify the debt collector in writing of any dispute within thirty days of receiving a debt notice or the debt will automatically be considered valid. Allows the debt collector to: (1) demand payment of a debt, and attempt to collect it, within the thirty days after giving the consumer notice; and (2) obtain information concerning location, income, asset, or credit of the consumer from any person besides the consumer's lawyer if the lawyer refuses to provide such information.

Declares that such Act provides no remedy, liability, or penalty for violations of State law.

Excuses a debt collector from liability for violations of such Act resulting from the use of a form of written communication approved by any State or Federal agency.

Requires a court, in determining whether a debt collector has failed to comply with such Act, to consider the effect of any act or omission of the debt collector upon a reasonable person.