Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/30/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/21/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/17/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/17/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/19/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/17/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 12/21/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/24/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/24/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 01/24/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/28/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/29/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/07/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/07/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/07/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/21/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/29/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/25/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/07/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/07/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/07/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/16/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/16/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/23/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/23/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/06/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/06/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/09/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/09/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/31/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/12/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/26/1996