There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Livestock Grazing Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for uniform management of livestock grazing on Federal land, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
04/25/1996For Further Action See S.1459.
09/12/1995Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
09/12/1995Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
07/11/1995Subcommittee Hearings Held. Hearings Printed: H. Hrg. 104-38.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
06/06/1995Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
06/05/1995Executive Comment Requested from Interior, USDA.
06/05/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
05/26/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Resource Conservation, Research and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/25/1995Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1995Referred to House Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1995Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (60)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/07/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/13/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/13/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/13/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/14/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/14/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/27/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/28/1995
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/12/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/13/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/19/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/24/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 08/02/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/21/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/27/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/27/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/17/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 10/19/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/26/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/18/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/18/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/23/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/01/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [R-TX-14] 05/29/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/29/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/29/1996

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources05/25/1995 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands06/05/1995 Referred to
07/11/1995 Hearings by
09/12/1995 Markup by
09/12/1995 Reported by
House Agriculture05/25/1995 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Resource Conservation, Research and Forestry05/26/1995 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1713. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/1995)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Management of Grazing on Federal Land

Subtitle A: General Provisions

Subtitle B: Qualifications and Grazing Preferences

Subtitle C: Grazing Management

Subtitle D: Authorization of Grazing Use

Subtitle E: Civil Violations and Failures of Compliance

Subtitle F: Unauthorized Grazing Use

Subtitle G: Procedure

Subtitle H: Advisory Committees

Subtitle I: Reports

Title II: Grassland

Livestock Grazing Act - Title I: Management of Grazing on Federal Land - Subtitle A: General Provisions - Sets forth findings, objectives, and definitions.

States that land use plans shall manage livestock grazing under the principle of multiple use and sustained yield.

Subtitle B: Qualifications and Grazing Preferences - Sets forth: (1) mandatory qualifications for grazing use on Federal land; (2) grazing preferences (base property and specifying grazing preference); and (3) allocations resulting from changes in Federal land acreage.

Subtitle C: Grazing Management - Requires the creation of allotment management plans and sets forth required plan contents.

(Sec. 122) Authorizes Secretary of the Interior-lessees range improvement cooperative agreements.

(Sec. 123) States that no water rights shall be acquired or transferred in connection with livestock grazing management unless authorized by State law.

Subtitle D: Authorization of Grazing Use - Requires grazing applications to be filed at local Bureau of Land Management offices. Specifies permit and lease terms and conditions.

(Sec. 135) Sets forth livestock ownership and identification provisions.

(Sec. 137) Establishes a grazing fee based upon the gross value of livestock production.

Subtitle E: Civil Violations and Failures of Compliance - Sets forth civil sanctions for specified acts of noncompliance.

Subtitle F: Unauthorized Grazing Use - Specifies damages for unauthorized grazing use, including livestock impoundment and sale.

Subtitle G: Procedure - Sets forth specified grazing permit or lease procedures.

Subtitle H: Advisory Committees - Directs the Secretary to establish: (1) grazing use advisory committees; and (2) resource advisory councils and grazing advisory councils for each grazing district.

Subtitle I: Reports - Directs the Secretary to report annually to the Congress regarding grazing revenues, costs, and rangeland management.

Title II: Grassland - Amends the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974 to remove National Grasslands and land utilization projects from National Forest System management.

Amends the Bankhead-Jones Farm Tenant Act to provide for a program of land conservation and utilization to accomplish livestock grazing purposes.