Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/27/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/27/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/27/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/02/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/06/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/06/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/14/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/14/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/14/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/14/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/29/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/29/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/10/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/10/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/10/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/13/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/13/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 10/13/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/18/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/24/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/24/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/26/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/26/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/26/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/26/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/31/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/31/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/31/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/07/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/07/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/08/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/08/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/10/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/10/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/16/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 11/29/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/29/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/29/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 11/30/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 12/06/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 12/15/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/21/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 12/21/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/03/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/03/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/23/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/01/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/27/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/27/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/04/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/06/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/06/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/06/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/12/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/12/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 05/09/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/16/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/04/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/10/1996