There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • National Film Preservation Act of 1996
  • National Film Preservation Foundation Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • National Film Preservation Act of 1996
  • National Film Preservation Foundation Act
Short Titles as Reported to House for portions of this bill
  • National Film Preservation Act of 1996
  • National Film Preservation Foundation Act
Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • National Film Preservation Act of 1995
  • National Film Preservation Foundation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the National Film Preservation Board, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/11/1996Became Public Law No: 104-285. (TXT | PDF)
10/11/1996Signed by President.
10/02/1996Presented to President.
09/28/1996Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11771-11773)
09/28/1996Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/29/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/28/1996Committee on House Oversight discharged.
05/06/1996Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-558, Part I.
05/25/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
10/11/1996Became Public Law No: 104-285. (TXT | PDF)
10/11/1996Signed by President.
10/02/1996HousePresented to President.
09/30/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/1996SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11771-11773)
09/28/1996SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/31/1996SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
07/29/1996-2:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/1996-2:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/29/1996-2:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/29/1996-2:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8609-8613)
07/29/1996-2:15pmHouseMr. Moorhead moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/28/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 333.
06/28/1996HouseCommittee on House Oversight discharged.
06/21/1996HouseHouse Committee on House Oversight Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 28, 1996.
05/06/1996HouseHouse Committee on House Oversight Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 21, 1996.
05/06/1996HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-558, Part I.
03/12/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/12/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/27/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property
07/27/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property
06/01/1995HouseField Hearings Held in Pasadena, California.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property
05/30/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/25/1995HouseReferred to House Oversight
05/25/1995HouseReferred to House Judiciary
05/25/1995HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/25/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/02/1995

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/25/1995 Referred to
03/12/1996 Markup by
05/06/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-558
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property05/30/1995 Referred to
06/01/1995 Hearings by
07/27/1995 Markup by
07/27/1995 Reported by
House Oversight05/25/1995 Referred to
06/28/1996 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary07/31/1996 Referred to
09/28/1996 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1734.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1734. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/29/1996)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Reauthorization of the National Film Preservation

Board

Title II: The National Film Preservation Foundation Act

Title I: Reauthorization of the National Film Preservation Board - National Film Preservation Act of 1996 - Repeals and replaces the National Film Preservation Act of 1992.

Directs the Librarian of Congress to continue the National Film Registry.

Reauthorizes the National Film Preservation Board.

Authorizes appropriations.

Title II: The National Film Preservation Foundation Act - National Film Preservation Foundation Act - Establishes the National Film Preservation Foundation as a charitable and nonprofit corporation (but neither an agency nor an establishment of the United States).

Makes the Librarian of Congress an ex officio non-voting member of the Board of Directors, who shall appoint the other Directors and the Board's initial Chair.

Authorizes appropriations, subject to matching private contributions. Prohibits the use of Federal funds for Foundation administrative expenses.