Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/25/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 05/25/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/07/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/13/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/13/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/14/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/19/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/22/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/10/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/10/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 07/10/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 07/10/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/10/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/10/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/11/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/19/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/25/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/25/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/25/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/28/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/09/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/28/1995