Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 06/06/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/19/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/19/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/19/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/19/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/19/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/19/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/19/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/19/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/26/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/26/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/26/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/26/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/26/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/26/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/30/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/11/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/11/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/17/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/17/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/17/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/17/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/17/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/17/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/06/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/06/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 10/12/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/26/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/23/1996