Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/22/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/22/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/22/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/22/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/22/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/22/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/22/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/22/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/22/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/22/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/22/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/22/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/22/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/22/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/22/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/30/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/30/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/30/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/30/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/30/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/30/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/30/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/30/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/30/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/13/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/13/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/13/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/13/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/13/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/13/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 07/13/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/13/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/13/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/13/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/13/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/28/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/28/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/28/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/28/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/28/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/28/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/28/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/28/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/28/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/28/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/28/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/28/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/04/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/04/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 08/04/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 08/04/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/04/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/04/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/04/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 08/04/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 08/04/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/08/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/08/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/08/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/08/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/20/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/20/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/20/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/20/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/20/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/20/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/20/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/20/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/20/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/20/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/20/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/20/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/20/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/20/1995