There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for cost recovery by the Department of Veterans Affairs of the cost of health care delivered to veterans who are eligible for care under the Medicare program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/07/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
07/14/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/19/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
06/09/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/07/1995Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
06/07/1995Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
06/07/1995Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
06/07/1995Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/07/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/07/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/19/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/25/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/27/1996

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce06/07/1995 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/19/1995 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/07/1995 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care07/14/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/07/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/09/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1767.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1767. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/07/1995)

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to reimburse a Department of Veterans Affairs health-care facility for care given to a Medicare-eligible veteran who is treated for a non-service-connected disability in the same amounts and manner as the Secretary reimburses other Medicare providers or Medicare HMOs.

Mandates that the Secretary of Veteran Affairs (Secretary) certify to the Secretary of Health and Human Services annually a list of all Department health-care facilities that are to be treated as Medicare providers or Medicare HMOs.

Requires that when the Secretary provides care for which the Secretary receives reimbursement under this section, the veteran must pay the Department any applicable deductible or copayment for care that is not covered by the Medicare program.