Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/08/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/08/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/28/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/28/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/28/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/28/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 08/03/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/03/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/03/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/03/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/14/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/14/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/12/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/12/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 10/25/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/25/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/25/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/25/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 10/25/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/02/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 11/02/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/02/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/02/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/09/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 11/20/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/06/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/06/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 12/06/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 12/06/1995