Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/08/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/08/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/08/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/08/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/20/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/20/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/19/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 12/19/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 12/21/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/21/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 01/25/1996