Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 06/08/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/15/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/15/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/15/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/15/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/20/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/14/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/29/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 03/27/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/15/1996