Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/27/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/27/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/27/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/27/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/27/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/27/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/27/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/27/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/27/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/30/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/30/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/30/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/18/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/18/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/18/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/18/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/18/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/21/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/21/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 07/21/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/21/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/21/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/21/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/21/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/21/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/21/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/21/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/21/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/21/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/31/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/31/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/31/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/31/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/31/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 08/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/07/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/07/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/07/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/07/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/14/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 09/14/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/14/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/14/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 09/14/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/14/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/14/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 09/14/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 09/14/1995