Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/14/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/14/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/14/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/20/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/20/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/20/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/20/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/20/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/20/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/20/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/20/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/20/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 06/20/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/26/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/26/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/26/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/26/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/26/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/26/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/26/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/26/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/26/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/26/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/26/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/27/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/27/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 06/29/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 06/29/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/29/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/29/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/29/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/29/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/29/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 06/29/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/29/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/13/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/13/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/13/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 07/13/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/13/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/20/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/20/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/20/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/04/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/04/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 08/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/06/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/06/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/06/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/27/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/27/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/17/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/17/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/17/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/17/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/17/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/26/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/06/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 11/06/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 11/09/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/09/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/09/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 11/29/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/29/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/29/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 01/26/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew