Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 06/14/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/14/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/26/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/31/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/31/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/03/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/06/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/12/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/12/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/12/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 10/10/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/10/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/10/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/19/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/26/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/26/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/26/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/30/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/30/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/08/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/12/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/24/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/17/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/24/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/24/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/25/1996