Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/29/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/11/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/11/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/27/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew