Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/15/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/15/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/15/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/15/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/10/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/10/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/10/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 08/03/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/03/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/03/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/03/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/17/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 10/17/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 11/07/1995
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 11/07/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/07/1995
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/28/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/19/1996
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/18/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/30/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/30/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/05/1996