Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/10/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/10/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/21/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/21/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/28/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/28/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/28/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/28/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/28/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/28/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/06/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/06/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/06/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 09/12/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/12/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/12/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/12/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/12/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/12/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/12/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/12/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/12/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/12/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 09/12/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/12/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/12/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/12/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/12/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/12/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/12/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/12/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/12/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 09/12/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 09/12/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/12/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/12/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/12/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/12/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/12/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/12/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/12/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/12/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 09/12/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/12/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/12/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/12/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/12/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/12/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/12/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/13/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/14/1995