There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal-aid Facility Privatization Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To permit State and local governments to transfer--by sale or lease--Federal-aid facilities to the private sector without repayment of Federal grants, provided the facility continues to be used for its original purpose, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/21/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
07/23/1996Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Government Reform and Oversight Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology
11/15/1995Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Government Reform and Oversight Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology
07/03/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/03/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/03/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/03/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/26/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
06/21/1995Referred to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/1995Referred to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/1995Referred to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/21/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform and Oversight06/21/1995 Referred to
House Government Reform and Oversight Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology06/26/1995 Referred to
11/15/1995 Hearings by
07/23/1996 Markup by
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/21/1995 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation07/03/1995 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads07/03/1995 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Surface Transportation07/03/1995 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment07/03/1995 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1907. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/21/1995)

Federal-aid Facility Privatization Act of 1995 - Requires executive agency heads to: (1) assist State and local governments in privatization efforts regarding federally financed infrastructure assets needed for a functioning economy; and (2) approve governmental asset privatization requests and waive or modify any grant assurance in accordance with specified criteria. Lists among such infrastructure assets roads, bridges, electricity supply facilities, airports, water supply and delivery facilities, recycling and wastewater treatment facilities, housing, schools, prisons, and hospitals, as well as other specified facilities.

Declares that no State or local government shall be obligated to repay Federal grant monies received in connection with assets being privatized.

Authorizes State and local governments to: (1) use asset privatization proceeds as permitted under grant assurances; and (2) recover capital investment, an amount equal to unreimbursed asset operating expenses in any infrastructure asset, and a reasonable rate of return.