Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/24/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/24/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/24/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/24/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/24/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/24/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/12/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/12/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/12/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/12/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/12/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/25/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/25/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/25/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 10/25/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/25/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 10/25/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/25/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/25/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/02/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/02/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/02/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 11/02/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/02/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/09/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/09/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/09/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/09/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 11/17/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/17/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/17/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/17/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 11/30/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 11/30/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/30/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 11/30/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/30/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/30/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/07/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 12/07/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 12/07/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 12/07/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 12/07/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/07/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 12/13/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/13/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 12/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 12/13/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 12/13/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/13/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 12/13/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 12/13/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/28/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/28/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 02/28/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/13/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/13/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/30/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/30/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/25/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 06/25/1996