Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/28/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 08/04/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/06/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/06/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/25/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/17/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 12/22/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/10/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/21/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/23/1996