Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 06/29/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/29/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 06/29/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/29/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 07/12/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/12/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/12/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/19/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/07/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/07/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/07/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 09/07/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/07/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/18/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/18/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/18/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/18/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/18/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/18/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/18/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/18/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 09/18/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/27/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/27/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/27/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/17/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/17/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/17/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/17/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/17/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/17/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/17/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/14/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/14/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 11/14/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/14/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/14/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/28/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/28/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/28/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/04/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/04/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/12/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/12/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/12/1996