Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/30/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 06/30/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/11/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/11/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/12/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/19/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/19/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 07/19/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/19/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/19/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/21/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/21/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/21/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/21/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/27/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/02/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/02/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 08/02/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 08/02/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/06/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/06/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/06/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/06/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/06/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/19/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/19/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/19/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/19/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/19/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/19/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/27/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/11/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/11/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/11/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/02/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/02/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 11/02/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/02/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/02/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/02/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/08/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/08/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 11/08/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 11/08/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/08/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/08/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/08/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/14/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/14/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/14/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/14/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 11/14/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/14/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 11/14/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/14/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/14/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/14/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/16/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/16/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/16/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/16/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/16/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/16/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/16/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/16/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/16/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 11/28/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/28/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 11/28/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/28/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 11/28/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 12/05/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/05/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 12/05/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 12/06/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 12/06/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 12/06/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 12/07/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 12/20/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 12/20/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 12/20/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 12/20/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/01/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/01/1996
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/01/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/28/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/28/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/14/1996
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/29/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/29/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/30/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew