Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/13/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/13/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/13/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/08/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/18/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/16/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/16/1996