Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/30/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/30/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 06/30/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/30/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/24/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/03/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/15/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/15/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/18/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 11/28/1995