Committees: H.R.2002 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations02/06/1995 Referred to
06/30/1995 Markup by
07/11/1995 Reported original measure H. Rept. 104-177
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation02/06/1995 Referred to
03/30/1995 Hearings by
06/21/1995 Markup by
06/21/1995 Reported by
Senate Appropriations07/26/1995 Referred to
08/04/1995 Markup by
08/04/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-126
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation08/02/1995 Markup by
08/02/1995 Reported by