Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/11/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 07/11/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 07/11/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/17/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/17/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/17/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/03/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/14/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/28/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/20/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/24/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/06/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/05/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/27/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/27/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/13/1996